This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 10/14/2021 at 05:02:50 (UTC).

Pavel Gagarin Plaintiff vs. Exantus Constr Inc Defendant

Case Summary

On 10/12/2012 Pavel Gagarin Plaintiff filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Exantus Constr Inc Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Singer, Michele Towbin. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8836

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Singer, Michele Towbin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gagarin, Pavel

Defendant

Exantus Constr Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Meacham, Robert C

 

Court Documents

Order of Dismissal- Lack of Prosecution

10/7/2015 - Order of Dismissal- Lack of Prosecution

Motion to Withdraw

11/22/2013 - Motion to Withdraw

Notice of Hearing

11/26/2013 - Notice of Hearing

Order Granting Motion to Withdraw

12/17/2013 - Order Granting Motion to Withdraw

Notice of Lack of Prosecution

12/9/2014 - Notice of Lack of Prosecution

Notice of Lack of Prosecution

7/16/2015 - Notice of Lack of Prosecution

 

Docket Entries

10/07/2015
View Court Documents

DispositionOrder of Dismissal- Lack of Prosecution; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 113280524

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2015

DispositionDismissed After Hearing - Other

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/16/2015
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Lack of Prosecution; /NOTICE OF HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2014
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Lack of Prosecution

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/17/2013
View Court Documents

DocketOrder Granting Motion to Withdraw; The Soto Law Group, P.A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/26/2013
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Hearing; December 9, 2013 at 8:45am RM 960

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2013
View Court Documents

DocketMotion to Withdraw; Party: Defendant Exantus Constr Inc

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2013

DocketSubpoena Issued By Attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2013

DocketSubpoena Issued By Attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2013

DocketSupplemental Answers to Interrogatories; /filed by def, Gregor Kohn

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
10/17/2012

DocketNotice of Hearing; 10-22-12 8:45 rm 960

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2012

DocketSummons Returned Served; 10/12/12; Party: Defendant Exantus Constr Inc

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2012

DocketMotion to Shorten Time; To Respond to Discovery Served With Complaint/Exhibits attached; Party: Plaintiff Gagarin, Pavel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2012

DocketSummons Issued; hb to ps; Party: Defendant Exantus Constr Inc

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2012

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2012

DocketPetition

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2012

DocketFiling Fee; Payor: MAY MEACHAM DAVELL PA ; Userid: CTS-mpreto ; Receipt: 20121YE1C006509; Comments: CK#24106/24107 ; Amount: $401.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2012

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: MAY MEACHAM DAVELL PA ; Userid: CTS-mpreto ; Receipt: 20121YE1C006509; Comments: CK#24106/24107 ; Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2012

DocketRequest for Production of Documents; (first) upon defendant Exantus Constr Inc

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2012

DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs; upon defendant Exantus Constr Inc; Party: Plaintiff Gagarin, Pavel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less