This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/29/2020 at 03:12:28 (UTC).

Patrick Fulcher Plaintiff vs. Nagamalleswara Rao Challa Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Patrick Fulcher Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Nagamalleswara Rao Challa Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Levenson, Jeffrey R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5783

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Levenson, Jeffrey R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fulcher, Patrick

Defendant

Rao Challa, Nagamalleswara

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Boettcher, Ian

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, P.A.

8151 Peters Road, Suite 4000

Plantation, FL 33324-1311

 

Court Documents

Request for Production

9/25/2020 - Request for Production

Civil Cover Sheet

9/23/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

9/23/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

9/23/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

Interrogatories & Notice of Service

9/23/2020 - Interrogatories & Notice of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; TO DEFENDANT, NAGAMALLLESWARA RAO CHALLA; Party: Plaintiff Fulcher, Patrick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $30,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; NAGAMALLESWARA RAO CHALLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories & Notice of Service; to deft; Party: Plaintiff Fulcher, Patrick

    Read MoreRead Less