This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 11/13/2020 at 23:05:22 (UTC).

Patricia Aliotta, et al Plaintiff vs. American Biltrite Inc , et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 08/29/2016 Patricia Aliotta, Plaintiff filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against American Biltrite Inc , Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bidwill, Martin J.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6056

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bidwill, Martin J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aliotta, Robert M.

Defendants

Domco Products Texas Lp

Borg-Warner Corporation

Honeywell International Inc

Pneumo Abex Corporation

Genuine Parts Co

Dal-Tile Corporation

Azko Nobel Paints Llc

Crossfield Products Corp

Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc

H.B. Fuller Co

Pfizer Inc

LENNOX INDUSTRIES, INC.

American Brake Bloc

RT Vanderbilt Company Inc

Allied-Signal, Inc

American Biltrite Inc

Pecora Corp

NAPA

Sears, Roebuck & Company

23 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Iovino, Caroline Marie

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

333 Avenue Of The Americas, Suite 4500

Miami, FL 33131-4338

Sturge, Clarke S, ESQ.

Attorney at COLE, SCOTT & KISSANE, P.A.

Dadeland Centre Ii, Suite1400, 9150 S. Dadeland Blvd

Miami, FL 33156

Pazos, Lucia V, ESQ.

Attorney at Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP

600 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1400

Miami, FL 33131

Davis, Evelyn F

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell Thackston & Young LLP

303 Peachtree Street N.E, Suite 4000

Atlanta, GA 30308-3243

Crump, Richard M

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley & Anderson LLC

200 South Lamar Street

Jackson, MS 39201-4099

Mercer, David A

Attorney at Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP

400 N Ashley Drive Suite 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

Reynolds, Charles E

Attorney at Trenam, Kemker, Scharf, Barkin, Frye, O'Neill & Mullis, PA

101 East Kennedy Blvd.,, Suite 2700

Tampa, FL 33602

Hawthorne, David Michael

110 Se 6Th Street, Suite 2600

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-5000

Briscoe, Edward J, ESQ.

Attorney at Fowler White Burnett PA

Espirito Santo Plaza 14Th Floor, 1395 Brickell Avenue

Miami, FL 33131-3302

Brink, Thomas F, ESQ.

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo LLP

5201 W Kennedy Blvd, Suite 450

Tampa, FL 33609

Other Attorneys

Smith, M Stephen

Attorney at RUMBERGER, KIRK & CALDWELL

Brickell City Tower, Suite 3000, 80 S.W 8Th Steet

Miami, FL 33130

Shea, Valerie

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

777 Brickell Ave Ste 1370

Miami, FL 33131

Vinocur, Rebecca Shull

Attorney at Rebecca S Vinocur PA

5915 Ponce De Leon Blvd., Suite 14

Coral Gables, FL 33146-2435

Ferguson, Timothy J

1395 Brickell Ave 14Th Flr

Miami, FL 33131

Cohen, Stuart Lance

Attorney at LUKS, SANTANIELLO, PETRILLO & JONES

150 West Flagler Street, Suite 2750

Miami, FL 33130

Gutierrez, Mathew D., ESQ.

Attorney at FOLEY & LARDNER, LLP

2 S. Biscayne Blvd, Suite 1900

Miami, FL 33131

Conigliaro, Matthew John

Attorney at Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, P.A.

4221 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 1000

Tampa, FL 33607-5780

Berry, Nickolas Charles

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd, Suite 400

Coral Gables, FL 33134-6044

Weinstein, Stuart A, ESQ.

Attorney at SHAPIRO BLASI WASSERMAN & HERMANN Pa

7777 Glades Road,Suite 400

Boca Raton, FL 33434-0000

Tomlin, Michael Timothy

Attorney at Edgard K. Cespedes, Esquire

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd, 4Th Floor

Coral Gables, FL 33134

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Summons Returned Served

5/3/2019 - Summons Returned Served

Notice of Cancellation

4/10/2019 - Notice of Cancellation

Notice of Cancellation

4/9/2019 - Notice of Cancellation

Notice of Cancellation

4/9/2019 - Notice of Cancellation

Notice of Cancellation

4/9/2019 - Notice of Cancellation

Notice of Cancellation

4/9/2019 - Notice of Cancellation

Notice of Postponement of Deposition DT

4/9/2019 - Notice of Postponement of Deposition DT

Notice of Cancellation

4/8/2019 - Notice of Cancellation

eSummons Issuance

8/29/2016 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

8/29/2016 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

8/29/2016 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

8/29/2016 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

8/29/2016 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

8/29/2016 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

8/29/2016 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

8/29/2016 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

8/29/2016 - Complaint (eFiled)

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

6/14/2019 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

289 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 2 Pages; Instrument Number: 115876521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DispositionDismissed Before Hearing - Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 4/12/19; Party: Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Postponement of Deposition DT; previously scheduled for April 11, 2019 at 9:00 a.m; Party: Plaintiff Aliotta, Robert M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation

    Read MoreRead Less
316 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Pfizer Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Pneumo Abex Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Premix-Marbletite Manufacturing Co.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant RT Vanderbilt Company Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Sears, Roebuck & Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Specialty Construction Brands Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Tarkett Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Tile Council of America

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Union Carbide Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Aliotta, Patricia

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allied Signal Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where PECORA CORPORATION (PECORA) is a litigant

Latest cases where Dal Tile Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where NAPA is a litigant