This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 10/14/2020 at 14:25:50 (UTC).

Paragon Industries Inc Plaintiff vs. Marty Kiar, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 12/15/2017 Paragon Industries Inc Plaintiff filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Marty Kiar, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bidwill, Martin J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2776

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bidwill, Martin J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paragon Industries Inc

Defendants

Leon M. Biegalski

Marty Kiar

Thomas Kennedy

White, Ryan E.

Zingale, Jim

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patricoff, Harold Edward, Jr.

Defendant Attorneys

White, Ryann Elise

Sherman, Richard A

Schwartzreich, Mila K

Dennis, Timothy E, ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Non-Objection

7/7/2020 - Notice of Non-Objection

Notice of Unavailability

2/6/2020 - Notice of Unavailability

Notice

8/1/2019 - Notice

Notice of Appearance

6/6/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Order for Substitution of Counsel

5/15/2019 - Order for Substitution of Counsel

Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

5/14/2019 - Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

5/14/2019 - Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

Notice of Unavailability

8/9/2018 - Notice of Unavailability

Reply to Answer

4/11/2018 - Reply to Answer

Answer

3/29/2018 - Answer

eSummons Issuance - Alias

3/14/2018 - eSummons Issuance - Alias

Order Amending

3/8/2018 - Order Amending

Motion for Substitution of Party(S)

3/7/2018 - Motion for Substitution of Party(S)

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

2/17/2018 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

2/7/2018 - Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

Summons Returned Served

2/7/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

2/7/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

2/6/2018 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/07/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Non-Objection

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2020
View Court Documents

DispositionStipulation for Dismissal; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 3 Pages; Instrument Number: 116593534

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Unavailability

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNotice; OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS/Defendant Jim Zingale Executive Director Florida Department of Revenue

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant Marty Kiar

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2019
View Court Documents

DocketOrder for Substitution of Counsel; Marty Kiar

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/14/2019
View Court Documents

DocketStipulation for Substitution of Counsel; MILA K. SCHWARTZREICH, ESQ FBN 85634; Party: Defendant Marty Kiar

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/14/2019
View Court Documents

DocketStipulation for Substitution of Counsel; MILA K. SCHWARTZREICH, ESQ FBN 85634; Party: Defendant Marty Kiar

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2018
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Unavailability

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2018
View Court Documents

DocketReply to Answer

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
01/09/2018
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant Leon M. Biegalski

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2017

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: HAROLD E PATRICOFF ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A176801; Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2017

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: HAROLD E PATRICOFF ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A176801; Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2017

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: HAROLD E PATRICOFF ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A176801; Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/26/2017
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Kennedy, Thomas

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/26/2017
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Marty Kiar

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/26/2017
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Leon M. Biegalski

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2017

DocketFiling Fee; Payor: ALEKSEY SHTIVELMAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A171932; Amount: $401.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2017
View Court Documents

DocketPetition (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Paragon Industries Inc

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2017
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less