This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/11/2021 at 21:00:40 (UTC).

Palms Of Pembroke Condominium Association Inc Plaintiff vs. Yak LLC, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 Palms Of Pembroke Condominium Association Inc Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Yak LLC, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, North Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Fry, John D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3571

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Fry, John D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Palms Of Pembroke Condominium Association Inc

Defendants

Yak LLC

Countrywide Home Loans Inc

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc

Unknown Tenants in Possession of Subject Property

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bogen, Michael D, ESQ.

Attorney at Bogen Law Group PA

7351 Wiles Rd Ste 202

Coral Springs, FL 33067

 

Court Documents

Complaint (eFiled)

2/10/2021 - Complaint (eFiled)

Notice of Lis Pendens

2/10/2021 - Notice of Lis Pendens

eSummons Issuance

2/10/2021 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

2/10/2021 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

2/10/2021 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

2/10/2021 - eSummons Issuance

Civil Cover Sheet

2/9/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Fld & Rec; Party: Plaintiff Palms Of Pembroke Condominium Association Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Countrywide Home Loans Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Unknown Tenants in Possession of Subject Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Yak LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Palms of Pembroke Condominium Association Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Countrywide Home Lons, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOGEN , MICHAEL D