This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 01/13/2023 at 02:21:54 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC Plaintiff vs. KAYAL MCLEOD Defendant

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KAYAL MCLEOD Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County South Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Miller, Terri-Ann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7250

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Miller, Terri-Ann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

Defendant

MCLEOD, KAYAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tise, Amanda Rolfe

P.O. Box 4400

Jacksonville, FL 32201-4400

 

Court Documents

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

12/2/2022 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

12/2/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

12/6/2022 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet; Additional Text; Amount: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement of Claim (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda Rolfe Tise