This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 01/13/2023 at 02:20:59 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC Plaintiff vs. CHARMAINE A SAMUELS Defendant

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CHARMAINE A SAMUELS Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County South Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Miller, Terri-Ann. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7241

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Miller, Terri-Ann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

Defendants

SAMUELS, CHARMAINE A

Samuels, Charmaine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lobello, Thomas, III

Attorney at Rolfe & Lobello PA

Post Office Box 4400

Jacksonville, FL 32201-4400

 

Court Documents

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

12/2/2022 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

12/2/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

12/6/2022 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet; Additional Text; Amount: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement of Claim (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lobello, Thomas, III