This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 03/05/2020 at 00:12:02 (UTC).

ONE POINT PHYSICIAN MEDICAL CENTER INC Plaintiff vs. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/31/2018 ONE POINT PHYSICIAN MEDICAL CENTER INC Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, North Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Fry, John D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1202

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Fry, John D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ONE POINT PHYSICIAN MEDICAL CENTER INC

Brenes, Thelma

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Naveo, Sadie Emilce

2000 Banks Rd, Ste 200

Margate, FL 33063

Defendant Attorney

Wilson, Sherline Cameron

Attorney at Mimi L Smith & Associates

250 S Orange Ave, Ste 600

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Order to Compel

9/21/2018 - Ex Parte Order to Compel

Notice of Hearing

9/21/2018 - Notice of Hearing

Ex Parte Motion

9/19/2018 - Ex Parte Motion

Calendar Call-Order Resetting Trial

8/15/2018 - Calendar Call-Order Resetting Trial

Notice of Hearing

8/10/2018 - Notice of Hearing

Order Resetting Hearing

7/6/2018 - Order Resetting Hearing

Agreed Order

5/18/2018 - Agreed Order

Motion to Stay

5/9/2018 - Motion to Stay

Expert Witness List

4/5/2018 - Expert Witness List

Notice of Hearing

4/5/2018 - Notice of Hearing

Notice of Interrogatories

4/5/2018 - Notice of Interrogatories

Request for Production

4/5/2018 - Request for Production

Notice of Appearance

3/8/2018 - Notice of Appearance

Case Management Order

3/5/2018 - Case Management Order

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

3/5/2018 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Service

2/7/2018 - Notice of Service

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

1/31/2018 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice

12/11/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionVoluntary Dismissal With Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116228039

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Rehearing; OR RECONSIDERATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionFinal Summary Judgment; Comment (AND FINAL SUMMARY DISPOSITION ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115375544

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Order to Compel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Motion; TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Case Management Hearing; ORDER RE-SETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCalendar Call-Order Resetting Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Party: Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • HearingPIP Pre-trial Hearing; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Judicial Officer(s): 70 Fry, John D.; Location: North Courtroom 4; CANCELED: Per Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Order; SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND RELATED REQUIREMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: SADIE E NAVEO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A015972; Amount: $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: SADIE E NAVEO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A015972; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where One Point Physician Medical Center Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILSON , SHERLINE CAMERON