This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 03/05/2021 at 00:43:13 (UTC).

One Biscayne Tower, LLC Plaintiff vs. Spar & Bernstein LLP Defendant

Case Summary

On 12/02/2015 One Biscayne Tower, LLC Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Spar Bernstein LLP Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Haury, William W., Jr.. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1202

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Haury, William W., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

One Biscayne Tower, LLC

Defendant

Spar & Bernstein LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Martin, Shane p, ESQ.

Attorney at Broad and Cassel

One Biscayne Tower, 21St Floor, 2 South Biscayne Blvd

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

Complete File Received

1/29/2016 - Complete File Received

Certified Mail Receipt Returned Unsigned

1/27/2016 - Certified Mail Receipt Returned Unsigned

Notice of Case Transfer

1/8/2016 - Notice of Case Transfer

Motion to Transfer

12/7/2015 - Motion to Transfer

Complaint (eFiled)

12/2/2015 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

12/2/2015 - Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

12/2/2015 - Civil Cover Sheet

Order of Transfer (Out of County)

12/10/2015 - Order of Transfer (Out of County)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplete File Received; IN COMPLIANCE WITH COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • DocketDon't Docket On This Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Mail Receipt Returned Unsigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Transfer; TO MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • DispositionDisposed by Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionOrder of Transfer (Out of County); Comment (TO MIAMI DADE COUNTY )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Transfer; Venue; Party: Plaintiff One Biscayne Tower, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • DocketFiling Fee; Payor: SHANE P. MARTIN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A173933; Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • DocketNo Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff One Biscayne Tower, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where One Biscayne Tower LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin, Shane Patrick