This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 03/05/2020 at 12:09:49 (UTC).

On The Rise Investments, LLC Plaintiff vs. Charline Demosthene, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 07/23/2018 On The Rise Investments, LLC Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Charline Demosthene, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DePrimo, Natasha. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7331

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DePrimo, Natasha

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

On The Rise Investments, LLC

Defendants

Pierre, Vachkianna

Demosthene, Charline

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Worman, Robert M

1200 S Pine Island Road, Suite 220

Plantation, FL 33324

Defendant Attorney

Kowal, Brian Phillip

Attorney at Law Office of Brian P. Kowal, PA

7351 Wiles Rd, Ste 103

Coral Springs, FL 33067

 

Court Documents

Mediation Report

8/16/2018 - Mediation Report

Order Disbursing Funds

8/14/2018 - Order Disbursing Funds

Copy of Receipt for Rent

8/6/2018 - Copy of Receipt for Rent

Notice Setting Mediation

8/2/2018 - Notice Setting Mediation

Order Referring Case to Mediation

7/27/2018 - Order Referring Case to Mediation

Copy of Receipt for Rent

7/26/2018 - Copy of Receipt for Rent

Notice of Appearance

7/26/2018 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Rent Determination Hearing

7/26/2018 - Motion for Rent Determination Hearing

Certificate of Mailing

7/24/2018 - Certificate of Mailing

Complaint (eFiled)

7/23/2018 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

7/23/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

7/23/2018 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

7/23/2018 - eSummons Issuance

Stipulation & Order Approving Settlement

8/14/2018 - Stipulation & Order Approving Settlement

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMediation Report; (Settled on The Day of Mediation)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketFunds Disbursed Per Ord; PL $1700.00 Ck#97164

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionStipulation & Order Approving Settlement; Comment (Joint Stipulation for Settlement/Order Approving Stipulation and Order of Dismissal )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Disbursing Funds; Order Releasing Funds In Court Registry to Pl(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCourt Registry Clerk's Fee; Payor: CHARLINE DEMOSTHENE ; Userid: CTS-phormell ; Receipt: 20183YF3E001083; Comments: AUGUST RENT ; Amount: $25.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketRent Receipt; Payor: CHARLINE DEMOSTHENE ; Userid: CTS-phormell ; Receipt: 20183YF3E001083; Comments: AUGUST RENT ; Amount: $1,120.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Receipt for Rent; X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Setting Mediation; AUGUST 13,2018.....12pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Referring Case to Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant Demosthene, Charline

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Rent Determination Hearing; Party: Defendant Demosthene, Charline

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing; To Charlene Demosthene/Vachkianna Pierre

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Demosthene, Charline

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Pierre, Vachkianna

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: ROBERT WORMAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A099367; Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ROBERT WORMAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A099367; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ROBERT WORMAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A099367; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOWAL , BRIAN PHILLIP