This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/10/2020 at 16:06:55 (UTC).

Olivinne Beckford-Williams Plaintiff vs. Heritage Property and Casualty Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/30/2019 Olivinne Beckford-Williams Plaintiff filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Heritage Property and Casualty Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, North Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Schiff, Louis H.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2476

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Schiff, Louis H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Beckford-Williams, Olivinne

Defendant

Heritage Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Feld, Rina

Attorney at Law Offices of Rina Feld

6919 Sw 18Th St.,, Suite 201

Boca Raton, FL 33433

Defendant Attorneys

Muniz, Charles A

1571 Sawgrass Corporate Parkway, Suite 400

Sunrise, FL 33323

Flickstein, Austin

Attorney at Bressler, Amery & Ross, P.C.

200 E. Las Olas Blvd., Ste. 1500

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

Request for Admissions

1/24/2020 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories

12/22/2019 - Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories

Agreed Order

12/11/2019 - Agreed Order

Order

11/22/2019 - Order

Order

11/13/2019 - Order

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

6/7/2019 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Cancellation

5/10/2019 - Notice of Cancellation

Agreed Order

5/9/2019 - Agreed Order

Motion for Extension of Time

4/28/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Hearing

4/23/2019 - Notice of Hearing

Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses

4/10/2019 - Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses

Agreed Order

3/29/2019 - Agreed Order

Motion for Extension of Time

3/22/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice

2/27/2019 - Notice

Motion for Extension of Time

2/27/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Complaint (eFiled)

1/30/2019 - Complaint (eFiled)

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

1/30/2019 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

eSummons Issuance

1/30/2019 - eSummons Issuance

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrivilege Log

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Order; on Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; Party: Plaintiff Beckford-Williams, Olivinne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; On Df Emergency Mot To Vacate ExParte Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Emergency Hearing; 11/22/2019 -2:30 PM- rm. 3 / ON DEFENDANT'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO VACATE

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY; Party: Defendant Heritage Property and Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; Party: Defendant Heritage Property and Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: RINA FELD ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A018256; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: RINA FELD ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A018256; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses; Party: Plaintiff Beckford-Williams, Olivinne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Party: Plaintiff Beckford-Williams, Olivinne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Austin Flickstein Esq

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MUNIZ, CHARLES