This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 07/01/2020 at 03:27:21 (UTC).

OJ Commerce LLC Plaintiff vs. Kuehne + Nagel Inc Defendant

Case Summary

On 05/13/2020 OJ Commerce LLC Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Kuehne Nagel Inc Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Singer, Michele Towbin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8025

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Singer, Michele Towbin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OJ Commerce LLC

Defendant

Kuehne + Nagel Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hecht, Shlomo Y

3076 N Commerce Pkwy

Miramar, FL 33025

 

Court Documents

Motion to Dismiss

6/18/2020 - Motion to Dismiss

Motion for Enlargement of Time

6/4/2020 - Motion for Enlargement of Time

Summons Returned Served

5/15/2020 - Summons Returned Served

eSummons Issuance

5/14/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Exhibits

5/14/2020 - Exhibits

Certificate of Compliance

5/14/2020 - Certificate of Compliance

Complaint (eFiled)

5/13/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

5/13/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION; Party: Defendant Kuehne + Nagel Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement of Time; TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; Party: Defendant Kuehne + Nagel Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 05-14-2020; Party: Defendant Kuehne + Nagel Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; KUEHNE + NAGEL INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits; A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance; Party: Plaintiff OJ Commerce LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); COMPLAINT FOR MONETARY DAMAGES AND DECLARATORY RELIEF; Party: Plaintiff OJ Commerce LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $30,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OJ Commerce, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where KUEHNE + NAGEL INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hecht, Shlomo Y