This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 14:38:38 (UTC).

Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company Plaintiff vs. Betina M Ramon Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/01/2018 Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Betina M Ramon Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DePrimo, Natasha. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1686

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DePrimo, Natasha

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company

Adeusi, Bernice

Defendant

Ramon, Betina M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Flores, Oscar A, ESQ.

Attorney at LDP LAW & ASSOCIATES

Po Box 452799

Sunrise, FL 33345

Defendant Attorney

Lahey, J Gregory

Attorney at Law Office of George Cimballa III

8151 Peters Road, Suite 1700

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

County - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

2/15/2019 - County - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

Reply to Answer

4/3/2018 - Reply to Answer

Notice of Filing

4/3/2018 - Notice of Filing

Request for Admissions

4/3/2018 - Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

4/3/2018 - Request to Produce

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

4/2/2018 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Appearance

4/2/2018 - Notice of Appearance

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

3/13/2018 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

3/13/2018 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Filing

3/1/2018 - Notice of Filing

Non-Military Affidavit

3/1/2018 - Non-Military Affidavit

Affidavit

3/1/2018 - Affidavit

Summons Returned Served

3/1/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

2/1/2018 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/1/2018 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

2/22/2019 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115632448

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCounty - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant Ramon, Betina M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 2:00 PM; Judicial Officer(s): 82 DePrimo, Natasha; Location: West Courtroom 260

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Plaintiff's Affidavit of Proof. Non-Military Affidavit; Party: Plaintiff Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit; BETINA M. RAMON; Party: Plaintiff Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit; OF PROOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 2-10-18; Party: Defendant Ramon, Betina M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: OSCAR A. FLORES ESQ. ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A016305; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: OSCAR A. FLORES ESQ. ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A016305; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lahey, J Gregory