This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 03/05/2020 at 13:51:32 (UTC).

Northwest Properties 111 Ltd Plaintiff vs. Chiquita Walters Defendant

Case Summary

On 07/25/2018 Northwest Properties 111 Ltd Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Chiquita Walters Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Feld, Ellen. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7392

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Feld, Ellen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Northwest Properties 111 Ltd

Defendant

Walters, Chiquita

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Baxter, Kaye Ann M

Attorney at Kaye-Ann Baxter, P,A

5220 South University Drive, Ste. C110

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33328

 

Court Documents

Order Disbursing Funds

9/17/2018 - Order Disbursing Funds

Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer

9/11/2018 - Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer

Notice Setting Mediation

9/7/2018 - Notice Setting Mediation

Mediation Report

9/4/2018 - Mediation Report

Notice Setting Mediation

8/27/2018 - Notice Setting Mediation

Returned Mail Undeliverable

8/23/2018 - Returned Mail Undeliverable

Notice Setting Mediation

8/21/2018 - Notice Setting Mediation

Copy of Receipt for Rent

8/9/2018 - Copy of Receipt for Rent

Notice of Filing

8/9/2018 - Notice of Filing

Motion for Default & Default

8/6/2018 - Motion for Default & Default

Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

8/6/2018 - Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

Non-Military Affidavit

7/31/2018 - Non-Military Affidavit

Summons Returned Served

7/30/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Certificate of Mailing

7/26/2018 - Certificate of Mailing

Civil Cover Sheet

7/25/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

7/25/2018 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

7/25/2018 - Complaint (eFiled)

Final Judgment for Eviction

9/17/2018 - Final Judgment for Eviction

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketFunds Disbursed Per Ord; PL $100.00 Ck#97671

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeWrit Issuance - Possession; Party: Defendant Walters, Chiquita

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionFinal Judgment for Eviction; Comment (as to Count I only ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115327750

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Disbursing Funds; striking Defts an answer and entering default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Strike Defendant's Answer; Party: Plaintiff Northwest Properties 111 Ltd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Setting Mediation; 09/06/2018 3:pm rm 251/2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMediation Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMediation Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Setting Mediation; 09/04/2018 @10:00am Room 222/1

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default & Default; Defendant CHIQUITA WALTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment of Eviction; Party: Plaintiff Northwest Properties 111 Ltd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 7-27-18; Party: Defendant Walters, Chiquita

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: KAYE-ANN M. BAXTER, P.A. ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A100854; Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: KAYE-ANN M. BAXTER, P.A. ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A100854; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Baxter, Kaye-Ann