This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 06/16/2021 at 17:50:26 (UTC).

Nezam Alli Plaintiff vs. Geico General Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 Nezam Alli Plaintiff filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Geico General Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Perlman, Sandra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1515

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Perlman, Sandra

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alli, Nezam

Defendant

Geico General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Boettcher, Ian

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, P.A.

8151 Peters Road, Suite 4000

Plantation, FL 33324-1311

 

Court Documents

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

6/11/2021 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

Civil Cover Sheet

6/10/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

6/10/2021 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

6/10/2021 - Complaint (eFiled)

Interrogatories & Notice of Service

6/10/2021 - Interrogatories & Notice of Service

Request for Production

6/10/2021 - Request for Production

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketPer AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $30,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Alli, Nezam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories & Notice of Service; Party: Plaintiff Alli, Nezam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; Party: Plaintiff Alli, Nezam

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOETTCHER , IAN