This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/27/2020 at 03:27:45 (UTC).

New Hampton at Century Village Condominium IV Asso Plaintiff vs. Pearlene Reed Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 New Hampton at Century Village Condominium IV Asso Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Pearlene Reed Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bowman, John B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5604

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bowman, John B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

New Hampton at Century Village Condominium IV Asso

Defendant

Reed, Pearlene

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mulrey, Tara Nicole

Attorney at Straley Otto

2699 Stirling Road Suite C-207

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33312

 

Court Documents

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

9/23/2020 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

eSummons Issuance

9/22/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Civil Cover Sheet

9/22/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

9/22/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

9/22/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

9/22/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Notice of Lis Pendens

9/22/2020 - Notice of Lis Pendens

Complaint (eFiled)

9/22/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

9/22/2020 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; none

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Pearlene Reed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Unknown Spouse of Pearlene Reed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Unknown Tenant #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Unknown Tenant #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; TARA N. MULREY, ESQ. FLORIDA BAR NO. 123890

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses; attorney@stralevotto.com

    Read MoreRead Less