This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 06/07/2020 at 00:30:17 (UTC).

National Water Restoration Inc Plaintiff vs. Pompano Beach Club North Defendant

Case Summary

On 05/08/2019 National Water Restoration Inc Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Pompano Beach Club North Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Robert W.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2468

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Robert W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

National Water Restoration Inc

Defendant

Pompano Beach Club North

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Miller, Holly K

Attorney at Levy & Partners, PLLC

3230 Stirling Rd, Ste 1

Hollywood, FL 33021

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

5/8/2019 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

5/8/2019 - Complaint (eFiled)

Order of Impending & Dismissal

2/14/2020 - Order of Impending & Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2020
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionOrder of Impending & Dismissal; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116352985

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: JONATHAN KORIN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A065887; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pompano Beach Club North Ass'n, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where National Water Restoration Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER , HOLLY K