This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/16/2021 at 15:47:04 (UTC).

National Union Fire Ins. Co. of Pittsburg, PA Plaintiff vs. Kin Yeung, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/30/2015 National Union Fire Ins Co of Pittsburg, PA Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Kin Yeung, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Haury, William W., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7393

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Haury, William W., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

National Union Fire Ins. Co. of Pittsburg, PA

Signature Consultants LLC

Defendants

Yeung's Consulting, Inc.

Yeung, Kin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jaffe, Steven R

Attorney at Farmer, Jaffe, Weissing, Edwards, Fistos & Lehrman, P.L

425 N. Andrews Ave., Suite 2

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant Attorney

Hackleman, Robert

7900 Glades Rd. Ste. 140

Boca Raton, FL 33431

 

Court Documents

Stipulation for Dismissal

11/17/2017 - Stipulation for Dismissal

Final Order of Dismissal

1/10/2018 - Final Order of Dismissal

eSummons Issuance

9/30/2015 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

9/30/2015 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

9/30/2015 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

9/30/2015 - Civil Cover Sheet

Affidavit of Service

12/11/2015 - Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service

12/11/2015 - Affidavit of Service

Motion to Dismiss

12/29/2015 - Motion to Dismiss

Response to Motion to Dismiss

4/13/2016 - Response to Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Hearing

4/19/2016 - Notice of Hearing

Notice of Appearance

4/20/2016 - Notice of Appearance

Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice

10/10/2016 - Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice

Order Granting Motion

10/18/2016 - Order Granting Motion

Order Deferring

1/3/2017 - Order Deferring

Notice of Hearing

3/1/2017 - Notice of Hearing

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionFinal Order of Dismissal; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 114830996

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DispositionDismissed After Hearing - Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionStipulation for Dismissal; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 2 Pages; Instrument Number: 114729565

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Deferring; RULING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion; FOR PRO HAC NICE ADMISSION OF ROBERT E. MEYER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • DocketPro Hac Vice; Payor: STEVEN R. JAFFE ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20161FA1A144096; Amount: $100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Robert E. Meyer. Movant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant Yeung, Kin; Party: Defendant Yeung's Consulting, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; on Monday, November 7, 2016, at 1:30 p.m., rm 780

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; THE COMPLAINT; Party: Defendant Yeung, Kin; Party: Defendant Yeung's Consulting, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; UPON DEFENDANT KIN YEUNG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; UPON DEFENDANT YEUNG'S CONSULTING INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • DocketFiling Fee; Payor: STEVEN R. JAFFE ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A143504; Amount: $401.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: STEVEN R. JAFFE ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A143504; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: STEVEN R. JAFFE ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A143504; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff National Union Fire Ins. Co. of Pittsburg, PA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Kin Yeung A/K/A Ken Yeung

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Yeung's Consulting, Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Signature Consultants LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE CO OF PITTSBURGH PEN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HACKLEMAN , ROBERT S