This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 06/22/2020 at 13:20:02 (UTC).

Mourad Voskinarian, et al Plaintiff vs. Pompano Beach Club Association, Inc., et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 Mourad Voskinarian, Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Pompano Beach Club Association, Inc , Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Frink, Keathan B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4211

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Frink, Keathan B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Voskinarian, Virginia

Voskinarian, Mourad

Defendants

Pompano Beach Club North Association, Inc.

Pompano Beach Club Association, Inc.

Pompano Beach Club North

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schwebel, Michael L, ESQ.

Attorney at Zimmerman & Frachtman P.A.

6991 N. State Road 7, 2Nd Floor

Parkland, FL 33073

Defendant Attorneys

Berga, Christopher G

1221 Brickell Ave, Floor 19

Miami, FL 33131

Tenzer, Brian Scott

Attorney at Conroy Simberg

3440 Hollywood Blvd Fl 2, Suite 700

Hollywood, FL 33021-6927

Friedman, Dale Lyn

Attorney at Conroy Simberg Flower Montessori School

3440 Hollywood Blvd, 2Nd Floor

Hollywood, FL 33021-6927

 

Court Documents

Response to Request for Production

4/27/2020 - Response to Request for Production

Privilege Log

4/27/2020 - Privilege Log

Response to Request for Admissions

4/27/2020 - Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

4/27/2020 - Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Production

4/27/2020 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

4/27/2020 - Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

4/27/2020 - Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice

4/3/2020 - Notice

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

3/5/2020 - Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Complaint (eFiled)

7/3/2019 - Complaint (eFiled)

eSummons Not Issued - Atty advised

7/3/2019 - eSummons Not Issued - Atty advised

eSummons Not Issued - Atty advised

7/3/2019 - eSummons Not Issued - Atty advised

Request to Produce

7/3/2019 - Request to Produce

Request to Produce

7/3/2019 - Request to Produce

Notice of Interrogatories

7/3/2019 - Notice of Interrogatories

Notice of Interrogatories

7/3/2019 - Notice of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

7/3/2019 - Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

7/3/2019 - Request for Admissions

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrivilege Log

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD & DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION/ ON BEHALF OF POMPANO BEACH ASSOCIATION, INC and POMPANO BEACH CLUB NORTH ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Voskinarian, Mourad; Party: Plaintiff Voskinarian, Virginia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Not Issued - Atty advised; wrong format

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Not Issued - Atty advised; wrong format

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; TO DEFENDANT, POMPANO BEACH CLUB ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; TO DEFENDANT, POMPANO BEACH CLUB NORTH ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Interrogatories; TO DEFENDANT, POMPANO BEACH CLUB ASSOCIATION, INC; Party: Plaintiff Voskinarian, Mourad; Party: Plaintiff Voskinarian, Virginia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Interrogatories; TO DEFENDANT, POMPANO BEACH CLUB NORTH ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; TO DEFENDANT, POMPANO BEACH CLUB ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; TO DEFENDANT, POMPANO BEACH CLUB NORTH ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pompano Beach Club North Ass'n, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHWEBEL , MICHAEL L