Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 05/13/2020 at 02:12:34 (UTC).

Moses Lee Paschal, III Plaintiff vs. Janice Todardo Reres Defendant

Case Summary

On 07/03/2018 Moses Lee Paschal, III Plaintiff filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Janice Todardo Reres Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6048

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paschal, Moses Lee, III

Defendant

Reres, Janice Todardo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ramirez-Gainza, Hilda R, ESQ.

Attorney at Gainza Law Group, LLC

400 S.E 8Th Street

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

Defendant Attorneys

Ryan, Anne M, ESQ.

Attorney at NICHOLAS J RYAN & ASSOCIATES

110 Se 6Th Street, Suite 2100

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Fiorello, Matthew Anthony

Attorney at Peterson Beernard

1550 Southern Blvd # 300

West Palm Beach, FL 33406-3240

Rutigliano, Vincent

2501 Hollywood Blvd, Suite 110

Hollywood, FL 33020-0000

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

5/1/2019 - Notice of Hearing

Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement

4/15/2019 - Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement

Notice of Production From Non-Party

1/15/2019 - Notice of Production From Non-Party

Re-Notice of Taking Deposition

12/18/2018 - Re-Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories

12/18/2018 - Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories

Response to Request to Produce

12/18/2018 - Response to Request to Produce

Answer to Amended Complaint

12/17/2018 - Answer to Amended Complaint

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

12/17/2018 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Re-Notice of Taking Deposition

12/12/2018 - Re-Notice of Taking Deposition

Amended Complaint

12/11/2018 - Amended Complaint

Agreed Order

12/11/2018 - Agreed Order

Notice of Taking Deposition

12/10/2018 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Motion to Dismiss

10/3/2018 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

9/12/2018 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

8/6/2018 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

Notice of Appearance

8/6/2018 - Notice of Appearance

Civil Cover Sheet

7/3/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

Request for Production

7/3/2018 - Request for Production

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116000717

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DispositionDismissed After Hearing - Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses; NOTICE OF CHANGE OF RESPONSIBLE ATTORNEY AND AMENDED DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO FLA. R. JUD. ADMIN. NO. 2.516(b)(1)(a; Party: Defendant Reres, Janice Todardo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Withdraw As Counsel; FOR THE PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Withdraw; Party: Plaintiff Paschal, Moses Lee, III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; May 14, 2019 at 8:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Serving Proposal for Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of No Objection

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant Reres, Janice Todardo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee; Payor: JUAN GAINZA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A091848; Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JUAN GAINZA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A091848; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; JANICE TODARDO RERES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Interrogs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ramirez-Gainza, Hilda R, ESQ.