This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/24/2020 at 17:38:53 (UTC).

Morguard Blue Isle LLC Plaintiff vs. Shawn Mattis Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 Morguard Blue Isle LLC Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Shawn Mattis Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barner, Florence Taylor. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2018

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barner, Florence Taylor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Morguard Blue Isle LLC

Defendant

Mattis, Shawn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lowenhaupt, Kenneth James, ESQ.

Attorney at Law Offices of Lowenhaupt Sawyers and Spinale

7765 Sw 87Th Avenue, Suite 201

Miami, FL 33173

 

Court Documents

Motion for Default & Default

2/12/2020 - Motion for Default & Default

Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

2/12/2020 - Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

Non-Military Affidavit

2/12/2020 - Non-Military Affidavit

Summons Returned Served

2/5/2020 - Summons Returned Served

Certificate of Mailing

1/30/2020 - Certificate of Mailing

Civil Cover Sheet

1/24/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

1/24/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

1/24/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

Default Judgment for Eviction

2/20/2020 - Default Judgment for Eviction

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued to BSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDefault Judgment for Eviction; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116364226

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default & Default; Party: Plaintiff Morguard Blue Isle LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment of Eviction; FOR REMOVAL OF TENANT; Party: Plaintiff Morguard Blue Isle LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit; Party: Defendant Mattis, Shawn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 2/3/2020; Party: Defendant Mattis, Shawn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing; Party: Defendant Mattis, Shawn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less