This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 07/04/2022 at 17:39:10 (UTC).

Mohamed Shariq Zaheer, et al Plaintiff vs. Fedex Ground Package System Inc, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 Mohamed Shariq Zaheer, Plaintiff filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Fedex Ground Package System Inc, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Frink, Keathan B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9167

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Frink, Keathan B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Zaheer, Mohamed Shariq

Andha, Hafsa Iqbal

Z, M

Defendants

Fedex Ground Package System Inc

Lopez, Jose Manuel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Quraishi, Maaz

1401 Forum Way, Suite 101

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

Request for Production

6/23/2022 - Request for Production

Request for Production

6/23/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatories

6/23/2022 - Notice of Interrogatories

Notice of Interrogatories

6/23/2022 - Notice of Interrogatories

Complaint (eFiled)

6/23/2022 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

6/23/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

6/24/2022 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

6/24/2022 - eSummons Issuance

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Jose Manuel Lopez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Fedex Ground Package System, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketPer AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $100,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer QURAISHI , MAAZ AHMAD