This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 05:34:54 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC Plaintiff vs. Vita Capri Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/02/2018 Midland Funding LLC Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Vita Capri Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Feld, Ellen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0004

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Feld, Ellen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Midland Funding LLC

Taylort, Ann

Defendant

Capri, Vita

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Winter, Robert A

Attorney at Cooling & Winter

7901 Sw 6Th Court, Suite 310

Plantation, FL 33324

Defendant Attorney

Markovic, Shaya, ESQ.

Attorney at Law Office of Shaya Markovic P.A.

1221 South 21St Avenue

Hollywood, FL 33020

 

Court Documents

Motion for Default

9/25/2018 - Motion for Default

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

6/12/2018 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

Alias Summons Returned Served

6/4/2018 - Alias Summons Returned Served

eSummons Issuance - Pluries Pretrial

4/19/2018 - eSummons Issuance - Pluries Pretrial

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

4/11/2018 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

Alias Summons Returned Unserved

4/10/2018 - Alias Summons Returned Unserved

Notice of Appearance

3/26/2018 - Notice of Appearance

eSummons Issuance - Alias Pretrial

3/5/2018 - eSummons Issuance - Alias Pretrial

Summons Returned Unserved

2/1/2018 - Summons Returned Unserved

Civil Cover Sheet

1/2/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

1/2/2018 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

1/2/2018 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

1/2/2018 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

6/13/2018 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115138112

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 2:00 PM; Judicial Officer(s): 83 Feld, Ellen; Location: West Courtroom 240

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAlias Summons Returned Served; 05-24-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pluries Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ROBERT WINTER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A052243; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 2:00 PM; Judicial Officer(s): 83 Feld, Ellen; Location: West Courtroom 240

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Alias Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ROBERT WINTER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A032201; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 2:00 PM; Judicial Officer(s): 83 Feld, Ellen; Location: West Courtroom 240; CANCELED: Summons Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: LAUREN N TURNER ESQ. ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A000167; Amount: $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: LAUREN N TURNER ESQ. ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A000167; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Markovic, Shaya, ESQ.