This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 16:20:59 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC Plaintiff vs. Sean Zanger Defendant

Case Summary

On 03/01/2019 Midland Funding LLC Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Sean Zanger Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, South Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Miller, Terri-Ann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2607

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    South Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Miller, Terri-Ann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Zanger, Sean

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fitzpatrick, Molly

P.O. Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

 

Court Documents

Summons Returned Unserved

11/14/2019 - Summons Returned Unserved

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

11/13/2019 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

eSummons Issuance - Pluries Pretrial

10/3/2019 - eSummons Issuance - Pluries Pretrial

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

9/18/2019 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

Pluries Summons Returned Unserved

9/11/2019 - Pluries Summons Returned Unserved

eSummons Issuance - Pluries Pretrial

8/22/2019 - eSummons Issuance - Pluries Pretrial

Alias Summons Returned Unserved

6/4/2019 - Alias Summons Returned Unserved

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

5/29/2019 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

eSummons Issuance - Alias Pretrial

4/22/2019 - eSummons Issuance - Alias Pretrial

Summons Returned Unserved

4/11/2019 - Summons Returned Unserved

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

4/11/2019 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

Complaint (eFiled)

3/1/2019 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

3/1/2019 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

3/1/2019 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved; Party: Defendant Zanger, Sean

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 62 Miller, Terri-Ann; Location: South Courtroom 220

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference; THE CLERK SHALL RESET PRETRIAL (11/13/19)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: MOLLY FITZPATRICK ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A179496; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pluries Pretrial; 2nd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 62 Miller, Terri-Ann; Location: South Courtroom 220

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference; THE CLERK SHALL RESET PRETRIAL (9/18/19)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPluries Summons Returned Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: MOLLY FITZPATRICK ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A161292; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pluries Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: MOLLY FITZPATRICK ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A058001; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Alias Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference; THE CLERK SHALL RESET (4/10/19)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 62 Miller, Terri-Ann; Location: South Courtroom 220

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A033051; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A033051; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FITZPATRICK, MOLLY KATHLEEN