This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 20:30:46 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC Plaintiff vs. Orlarry Jackson Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/12/2018 Midland Funding LLC Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Orlarry Jackson Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Francois, Phoebee. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1956

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Francois, Phoebee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Midland Funding LLC

Synchrony Bank/Walmart

Defendant

Jackson, Orlarry

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Winter, Robert A

Attorney at Cooling & Winter

7901 Sw 6Th Court, Suite 310

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Costs

5/21/2018 - Affidavit of Costs

Affidavit of Indebtedness

5/21/2018 - Affidavit of Indebtedness

Non-Military Affidavit

5/21/2018 - Non-Military Affidavit

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

5/21/2018 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Notice of Filing

5/21/2018 - Notice of Filing

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

3/23/2018 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

Summons Returned Served

3/2/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

2/12/2018 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

2/12/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

2/12/2018 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/12/2018 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Default Final Judgment

6/5/2018 - Default Final Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDefault Final Judgment; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115806833

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Costs; Party: Plaintiff Midland Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Indebtedness; Party: Plaintiff Midland Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Plaintiff's Default and Final Judgment; Party: Plaintiff Midland Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 81 Francois, Phoebee; Location: West Courtroom 240

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 02/23/2018; Party: Defendant Jackson, Orlarry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: ROBERT WINTER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A021705; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ROBERT WINTER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A021705; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less