This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 16:07:13 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC Plaintiff vs. Marie Grey Defendant

Case Summary

On 03/01/2019 Midland Funding LLC Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Marie Grey Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County South Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Miller, Terri-Ann. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2590

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Miller, Terri-Ann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Grey, Marie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fitzpatrick, Molly

P.O. Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

 

Court Documents

Default Final Judgment

11/26/2019 - Default Final Judgment

Complaint (eFiled)

3/1/2019 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

3/1/2019 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

3/1/2019 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Summons Served - Substitute Service

3/11/2019 - Summons Served - Substitute Service

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

4/10/2019 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

Affidavit of Indebtedness

5/16/2019 - Affidavit of Indebtedness

Non-Military Affidavit

5/16/2019 - Non-Military Affidavit

Affidavit of Costs

5/16/2019 - Affidavit of Costs

Notice of Filing

5/16/2019 - Notice of Filing

Final Disposition Form

5/16/2019 - Final Disposition Form

Affidavit in Support

11/21/2019 - Affidavit in Support

Notice of Filing Affidavit

11/21/2019 - Notice of Filing Affidavit

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDefault Final Judgment; Comment ((11/22/19) ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116200870

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Affidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit in Support

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Disposition Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Indebtedness

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 62 Miller, Terri-Ann; Location: South Courtroom 220

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference; DEFAULT (4/10/19)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Served - Substitute Service; 03-09-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A032851; Amount: $175.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A032851; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FITZPATRICK, MOLLY KATHLEEN