Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 15:18:55 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC Plaintiff vs. Jimmy Bryant Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/12/2019 Midland Funding LLC Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jimmy Bryant Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, North Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DeLuca, Steven P.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3154

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DeLuca, Steven P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Bryant, Jimmy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Manno, Bryan

Attorney at Andreu Palma Lavin & Solis PLLC

887 Donald Ross Road

Juno Beach, FL 33408

 

Court Documents

Writ of Garnishment Returned Served

1/16/2020 - Writ of Garnishment Returned Served

Notice

1/9/2020 - Notice

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

1/9/2020 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Contin Writ Garn & Req Procedure Forms

12/19/2019 - Contin Writ Garn & Req Procedure Forms

Motion for Continuing Writ of Garnishment

12/5/2019 - Motion for Continuing Writ of Garnishment

Notice of Firm Name Change

9/19/2019 - Notice of Firm Name Change

Affidavit of Costs

5/29/2019 - Affidavit of Costs

Certificate

5/29/2019 - Certificate

Motion for Entry

5/29/2019 - Motion for Entry

Non-Military Affidavit

5/29/2019 - Non-Military Affidavit

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

3/18/2019 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

Summons Returned Served

2/26/2019 - Summons Returned Served

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

2/12/2019 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

2/12/2019 - Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

2/12/2019 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/12/2019 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Default Final Judgment

6/10/2019 - Default Final Judgment

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment Returned Served; Garn - True Deliverance Christian Center Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Garn/True Deliverance Christian Center Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketCC/TC of Continuing Garnishment W/Req Forms Issd; To Attorney True Deliverance Christian Center Inc-Garn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketContin Writ Garn & Req Procedure Forms; TRUE DELIVERANCE CHRISTIAN CENTER INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Continuing Writ of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Firm Name Change; AND AMENDED NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS; Party: Plaintiff Midland Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDefault Final Judgment; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115873424

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 73 DeLuca, Steven P.; Location: North Courtroom 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference; Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 2/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: FEDERATED LAW GROUP PLLC ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A024266; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: FEDERATED LAW GROUP PLLC ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A024266; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Manno, Bryan