This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 16:21:44 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC Plaintiff vs. Abner Rosado Defendant

Case Summary

On 03/01/2019 Midland Funding LLC Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Abner Rosado Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, South Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Miller, Terri-Ann. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2608

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Miller, Terri-Ann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Rosado, Abner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fitzpatrick, Molly

P.O. Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

 

Court Documents

Notice of Filing

10/23/2019 - Notice of Filing

Affidavit of Indebtedness

7/18/2019 - Affidavit of Indebtedness

Non-Military Affidavit

7/18/2019 - Non-Military Affidavit

Affidavit of Court Costs

7/18/2019 - Affidavit of Court Costs

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

6/12/2019 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

Alias Summons Served - Substitute Service

5/23/2019 - Alias Summons Served - Substitute Service

eSummons Issuance - Alias Pretrial

5/4/2019 - eSummons Issuance - Alias Pretrial

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

4/11/2019 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

Summons Returned Unserved

4/4/2019 - Summons Returned Unserved

Complaint (eFiled)

3/1/2019 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

3/1/2019 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

3/1/2019 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Default Final Judgment

10/28/2019 - Default Final Judgment

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDefault Final Judgment; Comment ((10/25/19) ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116139337

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Indebtedness

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Court Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 62 Miller, Terri-Ann; Location: South Courtroom 220

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference; DEFAULT (6/12/19)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAlias Summons Served - Substitute Service; 05-18-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: MOLLY FITZPATRICK ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A064036; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Alias Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference; THE CLERK SHALL RESET (4/10/19)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 62 Miller, Terri-Ann; Location: South Courtroom 220

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A033126; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A033126; Amount: $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FITZPATRICK, MOLLY KATHLEEN