This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/10/2020 at 20:32:39 (UTC).

Metric Medical Center Inc Plaintiff vs. Windhaven Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/06/2019 Metric Medical Center Inc Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Windhaven Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DePrimo, Natasha. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2532

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DePrimo, Natasha

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Metric Medical Center Inc

Gerard, Roudeline

Defendant

Windhaven Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Boyd, R Brian

Attorney at Boyd Injury Law, P.A

8551 W. Sunrise Blvd., Suite 100-M

Plantation, FL 33322

Defendant Attorney

Moss, Shadae

P O Box 269015

Miami, FL 33126

 

Court Documents

Notice of Cancellation

8/28/2019 - Notice of Cancellation

Notice of Hearing

7/24/2019 - Notice of Hearing

Motion to Dismiss

5/6/2019 - Motion to Dismiss

Motion for Extension of Time

5/6/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Service of Interrogs

4/9/2019 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Request for Admissions

4/9/2019 - Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

4/9/2019 - Request to Produce

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

4/9/2019 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

4/9/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Service on Insurance Comm-Returned Served

3/7/2019 - Notice of Service on Insurance Comm-Returned Served

Demand for Jury Trial

3/1/2019 - Demand for Jury Trial

Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

2/12/2019 - Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

eSummons Issuance - Alias Pretrial

2/12/2019 - eSummons Issuance - Alias Pretrial

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

2/6/2019 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/6/2019 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Voluntary Dismissal W/O Prejudice

8/28/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal W/O Prejudice

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionVoluntary Dismissal W/O Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116021467

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • HearingPIP Pre-trial Hearing; Hearing Time: 2:00 PM; Judicial Officer(s): 82 DePrimo, Natasha; Location: West Courtroom 260; CANCELED: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; DUPLICATE LAWSUIT; Party: Defendant Windhaven Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; Party: Defendant Windhaven Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • HearingPIP Pre-trial Hearing; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Judicial Officer(s): 82 DePrimo, Natasha; Location: West Courtroom 260

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service on Insurance Comm-Returned Served; 2/25/2019 (Alias)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Party: Defendant Windhaven Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Alias Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: BOYD INJURY LAW ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A021142; Amount: $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: BOYD INJURY LAW ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A021142; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Metric Medical Center Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Windhaven Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moss, Shadae, ESQ