This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/28/2020 at 03:23:55 (UTC).

Meredith Gwinn Plaintiff vs. Godfrey Johnson Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Meredith Gwinn Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Godfrey Johnson Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Lopane, Nicholas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5698

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Lopane, Nicholas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gwinn, Meredith

Defendant

Johnson, Godfrey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniels, Monica E, ESQ.

Attorney at Attn: The Daniels Law Group, PLLC

120 N Federal Hwy, Ste 101

Lake Worth, FL 33460-3493

 

Court Documents

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

9/24/2020 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

Civil Cover Sheet

9/23/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

9/23/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

9/23/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

Request for Admissions

9/23/2020 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

9/23/2020 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

Notice of Interrogatories

9/23/2020 - Notice of Interrogatories

Request for Production

9/23/2020 - Request for Production

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $100,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Johnson, Godfrey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY; Party: Plaintiff Gwinn, Meredith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Party: Plaintiff Gwinn, Meredith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses; mdaniels@thedaniels-lawgroup.com; Party: Plaintiff Gwinn, Meredith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Interrogatories; Party: Plaintiff Gwinn, Meredith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; Party: Plaintiff Gwinn, Meredith

    Read MoreRead Less