Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 03/26/2021 at 23:29:30 (UTC).

MCBP Orthopedics & Neurosurgery Plaintiff vs. GEICO Indemnity Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 MCBP Orthopedics Neurosurgery Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO Indemnity Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Robert W.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4912

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Robert W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MCBP Orthopedics & Neurosurgery

Stokes, Lawren

Defendant

GEICO Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Abramowitz, Ross

Attorney at The Injury Firm

1608 East Commercial Blvd

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33334

 

Court Documents

Notice of Acceptance of Service of Process

3/25/2021 - Notice of Acceptance of Service of Process

Civil Cover Sheet

3/18/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

3/18/2021 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

3/18/2021 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • HearingPIP Pre-trial Hearing; Hearing Time: 2:00 PM; Judicial Officer(s): 53 Lee, Robert W.; Location: Central Ctroom 10165; CANCELED: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketPre-trial Cancelled Per AO 2020-85-CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Acceptance of Service of Process; March 25,2021; Party: Defendant GEICO Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff MCBP Orthopedics & Neurosurgery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCBP ORTHOPEDICS & NEUROSURGERY, PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Abramowitz, Ross Scott