This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/27/2020 at 14:40:35 (UTC).

Martin Pedro Magarinos Plaintiff vs. Nydia Cristina Bedoya Hernandez Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Martin Pedro Magarinos Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Nydia Cristina Bedoya Hernandez Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Perlman, Sandra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5668

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Perlman, Sandra

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Magarinos, Martin Pedro

Defendant

Bedoya Hernandez, Nydia Cristina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Darfoor, Kweku

Attorney at Darfoor Law Firm, P.A.

333 Las Olas Way, Cu-4, Suite 430

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

9/24/2020 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

Civil Cover Sheet

9/23/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

9/23/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

Request for Admissions

9/23/2020 - Request for Admissions

Interrogatories & Notice of Service

9/23/2020 - Interrogatories & Notice of Service

eSummons Issuance

9/23/2020 - eSummons Issuance

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $30,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Magarinos, Martin Pedro

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Party: Plaintiff Magarinos, Martin Pedro

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories & Notice of Service; Party: Plaintiff Magarinos, Martin Pedro

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Hernandez, Nydia

    Read MoreRead Less