This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/17/2020 at 08:11:20 (UTC).

Mark Curtis Plaintiff vs. Motiva Enterprises LLC Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 Mark Curtis Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Motiva Enterprises LLC Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Carol-Lisa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1687

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Carol-Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Curtis, Mark

Defendant

Motiva Enterprises LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Spier, Howard Alan

Attorney at Rossman Baumberger Reboso & Spier, PA

9155 S. Dadeland Blvd., Suite 1200

Miami, FL 33156

 

Court Documents

Summons Returned Served

2/4/2020 - Summons Returned Served

Civil Cover Sheet

1/29/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

1/29/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

Request for Admissions

1/29/2020 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

1/29/2020 - Request for Production

Notice of Service of Interrogs

1/29/2020 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

eSummons Issuance

1/29/2020 - eSummons Issuance

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 31 st day of January, 2020; Party: Defendant Motiva Enterprises LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $5,000,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Curtis, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Party: Plaintiff Curtis, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; Party: Plaintiff Curtis, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs; Party: Plaintiff Curtis, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Motiva Enterprises, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less