This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 12:57:17 (UTC).

MAR Holding Inc Plaintiff vs. Broward Coalition For The Homeless Inc Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/29/2018 MAR Holding Inc Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Broward Coalition For The Homeless Inc Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Feld, Ellen. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1599

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Feld, Ellen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAR Holding Inc

Defendant

Broward Coalition For The Homeless Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Simon, Charles

4987 North University Drive, #18A

Lauderhill, FL 33351

Defendant Attorney

David, John Thomas

Attorney at Law Offices of John T. David, P.A

10 South New River Drive East, Suite 202

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

Notice Setting Mediation

3/1/2018 - Notice Setting Mediation

Mediation Report

2/27/2018 - Mediation Report

Notice of Hearing

2/19/2018 - Notice of Hearing

Amended Notice of Hearing

2/17/2018 - Amended Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

2/14/2018 - Notice of Hearing

Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer

2/13/2018 - Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer

Reply

2/13/2018 - Reply

Notice of Appearance

2/7/2018 - Notice of Appearance

Copy of Receipt for Rent

2/6/2018 - Copy of Receipt for Rent

Answer to Affirmative Defenses

2/6/2018 - Answer to Affirmative Defenses

Motion for Mediation

2/6/2018 - Motion for Mediation

Motion

2/6/2018 - Motion

Civil Cover Sheet

1/29/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/29/2018 - Complaint

Stipulation & Order Approving Settlement

2/27/2018 - Stipulation & Order Approving Settlement

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketFunds Disbursed Per Ord; PL $2283.17 Ck#94339

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Setting Mediation; FEBRUARY 26,2018 at 12 pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionStipulation & Order Approving Settlement; Comment (and disbursing funds in Court Registry Forthwith ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 4 Pages; Instrument Number: 114917649

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMediation Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketMediation Fee; Payor: MAR HOLDING ; Userid: CTS-vlopez ; Receipt: 20183YF3E000289; Comments: PL ; Amount: $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketMediation Fee; Payor: BROWARD COALITION FOR THE HOME; Userid: CTS-vlopez ; Receipt: 20183YF3E000291; Comments: DF ; Amount: $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Mediation; Party: Defendant Broward Coalition For The Homeless Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketRent Receipt; Payor: BROWARD COALITION FOR THE HOME; Userid: CTS-lhardin ; Receipt: 20183YF3D000237; Comments: RENT FOR FEB 2018 ; Amount: $2,253.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketCourt Registry Clerk's Fee; Payor: BROWARD COALITION FOR THE HOME; Userid: CTS-lhardin ; Receipt: 20183YF3D000237; Comments: RENT FOR FEB 2018 ; Amount: $42.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; to Determine Rent; Party: Defendant Broward Coalition For The Homeless Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: CL SIMON PA ; Userid: CTS-bmills ; Receipt: 20183YF3G000008; Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: CL SIMON PA ; Userid: CTS-bmills ; Receipt: 20183YF3G000008; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint; FOR TENANT EVICTION AND MONEY DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued to Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less