Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/30/2020 at 12:42:08 (UTC).

Mangrove Bay Housing LLC Plaintiff vs. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 06/22/2017 Mangrove Bay Housing LLC Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Levenson, Jeffrey R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1532

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Levenson, Jeffrey R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mangrove Bay Housing LLC

Defendants

Schindler Elevator Corp

Carr Builders LLC

Lacerte Builders Inc

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Smith, Clark W

Attorney at Paxton & Smith, P.A.

Barristers Bldg., Suite 500, 1615 Forum Pl.

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

5/26/2018 - Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

Receipt for Transfer

6/22/2017 - Receipt for Transfer

Certified Copy

6/22/2017 - Certified Copy

Certified Copy

6/22/2017 - Certified Copy

Copy

6/22/2017 - Copy

Copy

6/22/2017 - Copy

Motion for Leave to Amend

6/22/2017 - Motion for Leave to Amend

Directions to Clerk-Disposed

7/27/2018 - Directions to Clerk-Disposed

Stipulation for Dismissal

8/28/2017 - Stipulation for Dismissal

Order of Dismissal With Prejudice

8/28/2017 - Order of Dismissal With Prejudice

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDirections to Clerk-Disposed; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115236925

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCircuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionStipulation for Dismissal; Comment (WITH PREJUDICE ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 2 Pages; Instrument Number: 114620205

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionOrder of Dismissal With Prejudice; Comment (of Defendant/Third Party Plaintiff CARR BUILDERS, LLC ("Carr Builders"), and Third Party Defendant SCHINDLER ELEVATOR CORPORATION ("Schindler") ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 2 Pages; Instrument Number: 114616582

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt for Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Copy; of Palm Beach Progress Docket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Copy; of Order Granting Change of Venue and Transferring Counts IV, V and VI of the Amended Third Party Complaint to the Seventeeth Judicial Circuit Broward County Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy; of Order Granting Change of Venue and Transferring Counts IV, V, and VI of the Amended Third Party Complaint to the Seventeenth Judicial Circuit Broward County Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketFiling Fee; Payor: SHAPIRO BLASI WASSERMAN ; Userid: CTS-mbyrd ; Receipt: 20171YE1V000118; Comments: CHK # 36677 ; Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy; of Agreed Order on Deft Carr Builder's Motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint/Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Leave to Amend; THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT; Party: Defendant Carr Builders LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MANGROVE BAY HOUSING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LACERTE BUILDERS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Schindler Elevator Corporation is a litigant