This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 07/17/2020 at 16:30:36 (UTC).

Mancini Development 1601 LLC Plaintiff vs. DS Healthcare Group Inc Defendant

Case Summary

On 06/12/2017 Mancini Development 1601 LLC Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against DS Healthcare Group Inc Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, North Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Schiff, Louis H.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4617

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    North Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Schiff, Louis H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mancini Development 1601 LLC

Defendant

DS Healthcare Group Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Harmon, Blake M, ESQ.

Attorney at Patterson & Harmon PA

4701 North Federal Highway, Suite 480 Box A-6

Pompano Beach, FL 33064

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Returned Served

7/31/2017 - Writ of Possession Returned Served

Motion for Default & Default

6/23/2017 - Motion for Default & Default

Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

6/23/2017 - Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

Affidavit of Attorney Fees

6/23/2017 - Affidavit of Attorney Fees

Affidavit of Costs

6/23/2017 - Affidavit of Costs

Summons Returned Served

6/16/2017 - Summons Returned Served

Civil Cover Sheet

6/12/2017 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

6/12/2017 - Complaint (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance

6/12/2017 - eSummons Issuance

Final Judgment for Eviction

6/27/2017 - Final Judgment for Eviction

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DocketCertified Copy Fee; Payor: LAW OFFICES PATTERSON H ; Userid: CTS-sflue ; Receipt: 20172YF2D000650; Amount: $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DocketCertified Copy; OF FINAL JDGT MAILED TO PL ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued to BSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionFinal Judgment for Eviction; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 114472168

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default & Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment of Eviction; Party: Plaintiff Mancini Development 1601 LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Attorney Fees; Party: Plaintiff Mancini Development 1601 LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Costs; Party: Plaintiff Mancini Development 1601 LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 6/15/17; Party: Defendant DS Healthcare Group Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: BLAKE M HARMON ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A081340; Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: BLAKE M HARMON ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A081340; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DS Healthcare Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Harmon, Blake M, ESQ.