This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/02/2021 at 23:54:16 (UTC).

LPP Mtg LTD Plaintiff vs. Adrian Goldfarb, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 06/03/2015 LPP Mtg LTD Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Adrian Goldfarb, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gundersen, Andrea Ruth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9816

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gundersen, Andrea Ruth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LPP Mtg LTD

Defendants

Cypress Head Club, Inc

Goldfarb, Adrian

Third Fed Savings and Loan Assn of Cleveland, MHC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Meisels, Jonathan

Attorney at Robertson , Anschutz,Schneid ,Crane & Partners, PLLC

6409 Congress Avenue, Suite 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant Attorneys

Brodie, Jason, ESQ.

Attorney at Brodie & Friedman Pa

1675 N Military Trail Ste 550

Boca Raton, FL 33486-0000

Basulto, Marisol Rodriguez

Attorney at Basulto Robbins & Associates, LLP

14160 Nw 77Th Court, Suite 22

Miami Lakes, FL 33016-0000

Saoud, Aaron

Attorney at Saoud Law & Associates, P.A.

419 W. Platt Street

Tampa, FL 33606

Treusch, Andy

Attorney at TREUSCH LAW GROUP PA

1535 Rambling Oaks Ln

Deland, FL 32720-3640

Field, Shannan M., ESQ.

Attorney at The Law office of Shannan M. Field, P.A.

1079 Cheney Hwy

Titusville, FL 32780

Palmer, Adam D

Attorney at PALMER LAW

4755 Technology Way, Suite 204

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Price, Ashleigh L

Attorney at Gilbert Garcia Group, P.A.

2313 W Violet St

Tampa, FL 33603

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Title

1/13/2017 - Certificate of Title

Notice

1/10/2017 - Notice

Bid Sheet

11/30/2016 - Bid Sheet

Certificate of Sale

11/30/2016 - Certificate of Sale

Proof of Publication

11/1/2016 - Proof of Publication

Motion to Compel

10/30/2016 - Motion to Compel

Order for Substitution of Counsel

10/25/2016 - Order for Substitution of Counsel

Order for Substitution of Counsel

10/25/2016 - Order for Substitution of Counsel

Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

10/19/2016 - Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney

10/18/2016 - Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney

Notice of Appearance

10/16/2016 - Notice of Appearance

Certificate of Service

10/14/2016 - Certificate of Service

Final Disposition Form

10/11/2016 - Final Disposition Form

Not of Filing Original Note & Mortgage

10/11/2016 - Not of Filing Original Note & Mortgage

Notice of Filing

10/11/2016 - Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing

10/11/2016 - Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing

10/11/2016 - Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing

10/11/2016 - Notice of Filing

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Title

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; OF WITHDRAWING MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS AND COMPEL MEDIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • DocketComment:; TITLE NIT ISSUED; OPEN MOT TO STAY PROCEEDINGS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBid Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Sale

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • HearingForeclosure Sale; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): Not Applicable, ,; Location: On-line @ www.broward.realforeclose.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • DocketForeclosure Sale Fee; Payor: DAVID SCHNEID ; Userid: CTS- ; Receipt: 20161RA1A012064; Amount: $70.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Publication; SALE 11/29/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • DocketComment:; FILE CREATED FOR ORGINAL DOCS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; MEDIATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS; Party: Defendant Goldfarb, Adrian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue Claim Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; OF SUBMITTING FLA.STAT.ti 702.015(4) CERTIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE; Party: Plaintiff LPP Mtg LTD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Goldfarb, Adrian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ADRIAN GOLDFARB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Third Fed Savings and Loan Assn of Cleveland, MHC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Cypress Head Club, Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Brodie & Friedman, PA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lpp Mtg Ltd is a litigant

Latest cases where Cypres Head Club Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAOUD , AARON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDY TREUSCH