This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 16:52:55 (UTC).

Long Shot International Inc Plaintiff vs. Maria Maestrecase Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/05/2018 Long Shot International Inc Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Maria Maestrecase Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Feld, Ellen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1779

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Feld, Ellen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Long Shot International Inc

Defendant

Maestrecase, Maria

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hochberg, Carolyn

Attorney at Hochberg & DiRienzo PA

2946 E Commercial Blvd

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33308

Defendant Attorney

Edson, Laurence J, ESQ.

1700 S. Dixie Highway, Suite 501

Boca Raton, FL 33432

 

Court Documents

Opposition

4/5/2018 - Opposition

Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

4/2/2018 - Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

Notice of Hearing

2/24/2018 - Notice of Hearing

Notice Setting Mediation

2/15/2018 - Notice Setting Mediation

Mediation Report

2/15/2018 - Mediation Report

Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer

2/8/2018 - Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer

Copy of Receipt for Rent

2/8/2018 - Copy of Receipt for Rent

Certified Copy

2/7/2018 - Certified Copy

Certified Copy

2/7/2018 - Certified Copy

Order Referring Case to Mediation

2/7/2018 - Order Referring Case to Mediation

Certified Copy of Order to Transfer

2/5/2018 - Certified Copy of Order to Transfer

Stipulation & Order Approving Settlement

3/2/2018 - Stipulation & Order Approving Settlement

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition; TO ENTRY OF FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION; Party: Defendant Maestrecase, Maria

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment of Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketFunds Disbursed Per Ord; PL $1650.00 Ck#94623

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionStipulation & Order Approving Settlement; Comment (AND DISBURSING FUNDS IN CT REGISTRY FORTHWITH ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 114926148

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Setting Mediation; FEBRUARY 15,2018 9 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMediation Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Strike Defendant's Answer; Party: Plaintiff Long Shot International Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Receipt for Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketCourt Registry Clerk's Fee; Payor: MARIA MAESTRECASE ; Userid: CTS-yramsay ; Receipt: 20183YF3D000250; Amount: $21.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketRent Receipt; Payor: MARIA MAESTRECASE ; Userid: CTS-yramsay ; Receipt: 20183YF3D000250; Amount: $825.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Copy; of progress docket from coce 18-567

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Copy; of order of transfer from coce 18-567

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Referring Case to Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: HOCHBERG DIRIENZO PA ; Userid: CTS-bmills ; Receipt: 20183YF3G000010 Reason: F13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: HOCHBERG DIRIENZO PA ; Userid: CTS-bmills ; Receipt: 20183YF3G000010 Reason: F13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Copy of Order to Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less