This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/09/2020 at 17:50:20 (UTC).

Lm No 16 Reflections II LLC Plaintiff vs. Jonathan Fernandez Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/20/2020 Lm No 16 Reflections II LLC Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Jonathan Fernandez Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Di Pietro, Nina W.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1374

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Di Pietro, Nina W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lm No 16 Reflections II LLC

Water Terrace

Defendant

Fernandez, Jonathan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lowenhaupt, Kenneth James, ESQ.

Attorney at Law Offices of Lowenhaupt Sawyers and Spinale

7765 Sw 87Th Avenue, Suite 201

Miami, FL 33173

 

Court Documents

Motion for Approval

2/6/2020 - Motion for Approval

Stipulation

2/6/2020 - Stipulation

Summons Served-Posted

1/28/2020 - Summons Served-Posted

Certificate of Mailing

1/23/2020 - Certificate of Mailing

Civil Cover Sheet

1/20/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

1/20/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

1/20/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Approval; MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSAL; Party: Plaintiff Lm No 16 Reflections II LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation; FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Served-Posted; 1/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing; Party: Defendant Fernandez, Jonathan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less