This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/08/2020 at 13:22:53 (UTC).

Les Chalet Investments LLC Plaintiff vs. Karen Skyers Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 Les Chalet Investments LLC Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Karen Skyers Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Miranda, Giuseppina. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2249

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Miranda, Giuseppina

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Les Chalet Investments LLC

Defendant

Skyers, Karen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lowenhaupt, Kenneth James, ESQ.

Attorney at Law Offices of Lowenhaupt Sawyers and Spinale

7765 Sw 87Th Avenue, Suite 201

Miami, FL 33173

 

Court Documents

Summons Served-Posted

1/31/2019 - Summons Served-Posted

Stipulation

1/28/2019 - Stipulation

Motion

1/28/2019 - Motion

Certificate of Mailing

1/24/2019 - Certificate of Mailing

Civil Cover Sheet

1/18/2019 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

1/18/2019 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

1/18/2019 - Complaint (eFiled)

Order Approving Settlement

2/4/2019 - Order Approving Settlement

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionOrder Approving Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Served-Posted; 1/25/19; Party: Defendant Skyers, Karen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation; FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; FOR AN ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSAL; Party: Plaintiff Les Chalet Investments LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing; Party: Defendant Skyers, Karen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: KENNETH J LOWENHAUPT ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A010588; Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: KENNETH J LOWENHAUPT ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A010588; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less