This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 06/14/2021 at 19:55:43 (UTC).

Leonard W. Kraisel Plaintiff vs. Broward County Property Appraiser Defendant

Case Summary

On 07/25/2013 Leonard W Kraisel Plaintiff filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Broward County Property Appraiser Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bowman, John B.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7709

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bowman, John B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kraisel, Leonard W.

Defendant

Broward County Property Appraiser

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gros-Dubois, Eric P

Defendant Attorney

Mathias, Jerrod

 

Court Documents

Order

4/9/2014 - Order

Petition (eFiled)

7/25/2013 - Petition (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

7/25/2013 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

8/8/2013 - eSummons Issuance

Affidavit of Service

8/13/2013 - Affidavit of Service

Answer

9/3/2013 - Answer

Notice of Appearance

9/3/2013 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Summary Final Judgment

2/11/2014 - Motion for Summary Final Judgment

Notice of Hearing

2/11/2014 - Notice of Hearing

Re-Notice of Hearing

2/11/2014 - Re-Notice of Hearing

Motion for Summary Final Judgment

3/19/2014 - Motion for Summary Final Judgment

Response to Motion for Judgment

3/27/2014 - Response to Motion for Judgment

Order Setting Case Management Conference

6/8/2015 - Order Setting Case Management Conference

Order Setting Case Management Conference

6/8/2015 - Order Setting Case Management Conference

Directions to the Clerk

6/16/2015 - Directions to the Clerk

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/19/2015

DispositionDisposed by Judge

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2015
View Court Documents

DocketDirections to the Clerk; /Order Granting Mot for Summary Judgment 04-09-14

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2015
View Court Documents

DocketOrder Setting Case Management Conference; 07/15/2015 at 8:45 a.m. Rm 910 A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2015
View Court Documents

DocketOrder Setting Case Management Conference; 07/15/2015 TIME 8:45A.M RM 910A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/09/2014
View Court Documents

DispositionOrder; Comment (GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 2 Pages; Instrument Number: 113059618

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2014
View Court Documents

DocketResponse to Motion for Judgment; FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Party: Plaintiff Kraisel, Leonard W.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2014
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Summary Final Judgment; Party: Defendant Broward County Property Appraiser

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2014
View Court Documents

DocketRe-Notice of Hearing; 4/9/14 @ 2:15 PM, RM 840

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2014
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Hearing; March 6th, 2014 at 11:45 am in room 840

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2014
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Summary Final Judgment; VERIFIED; Party: Plaintiff Kraisel, Leonard W.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/03/2013
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Appearance; & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516/lori parrish; Party: Defendant Broward County Property Appraiser

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/03/2013
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer; LORI PARRISH; Party: Defendant Broward County Property Appraiser

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2013
View Court Documents

DocketAffidavit of Service; 08/09/13 BROWARD COUNTY PROPERTY APPRAISER'S OFFICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2013
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Broward County Property Appraiser

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2013

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ERIC PAUL GROS-DUBOIS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20131FA1A048606; Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2013
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2013
View Court Documents

DocketPetition (eFiled); FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT; Party: Plaintiff Kraisel, Leonard W.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2013

DocketFiling Fee; Payor: ERIC PAUL GROS-DUBOIS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20131FA1A041573; Amount: $401.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less