This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 17:12:42 (UTC).

Legendry Restoration, Inc Plaintiff vs. Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/06/2018 Legendry Restoration, Inc Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Universal Property Casualty Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DePrimo, Natasha. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1800

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DePrimo, Natasha

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Legendry Restoration, Inc

Lam, Denis

Defendant

Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Saidenstat, Jeffrey, ESQ.

Attorney at The Diener Firm, P.A.

8751 W. Broward Boulevard, Suite 404

Plantation, FL 33324

Defendant Attorney

Brant, Todd E

1110 West Commercial Blvd

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

 

Court Documents

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

3/13/2018 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

Notice of Settlement

3/5/2018 - Notice of Settlement

Notice of Appearance

2/16/2018 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Service on Insurance Comm-Returned Served

2/8/2018 - Notice of Service on Insurance Comm-Returned Served

Request for Production

2/6/2018 - Request for Production

Notice of Service of Interrogs

2/6/2018 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Request for Admissions

2/6/2018 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

2/6/2018 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/6/2018 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

2/6/2018 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

2/6/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

3/16/2018 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 114952782

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 2:00 PM; Judicial Officer(s): 82 DePrimo, Natasha; Location: West Courtroom 260

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Party: Plaintiff Legendry Restoration, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service on Insurance Comm-Returned Served; 2-6-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: ERIK D. DIENER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A018501; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; Party: Plaintiff Legendry Restoration, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs; Party: Plaintiff Legendry Restoration, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Party: Plaintiff Legendry Restoration, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial; Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ERIK D. DIENER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A018501; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less