This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/28/2020 at 03:02:05 (UTC).

Landon Martini Plaintiff vs. City Of Deerfield Beach Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Landon Martini Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against City Of Deerfield Beach Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Haimes, David A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5670

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Haimes, David A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martini, Landon

Defendant

City Of Deerfield Beach

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fulton, Jesse S, ESQ.

Attorney at THE BERMAN LAW GROUP

Po Box 272789

Boca Raton, FL 33427

 

Court Documents

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

9/24/2020 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

Civil Cover Sheet

9/23/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

9/23/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

Request to Produce

9/23/2020 - Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

9/23/2020 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogs

9/23/2020 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

eSummons Issuance

9/23/2020 - eSummons Issuance

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $100,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Martini, Landon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Party: Plaintiff Martini, Landon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Party: Plaintiff Martini, Landon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs; Party: Plaintiff Martini, Landon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant City Of Deerfield Beach

    Read MoreRead Less