This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 10/17/2021 at 11:51:42 (UTC).

Lakeside Nat Foods Inc Plaintiff vs. Dennis E Quarles, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 12/11/2012 Lakeside Nat Foods Inc Plaintiff filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Dennis E Quarles, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Robinson, Michael A.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4239

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Robinson, Michael A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lakeside Nat Foods Inc

Defendants

Quarles, Dennis E

Quarles, Kimberly S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gill, Albert Gavin-Wayne

 

Court Documents

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

4/3/2014 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

Notice of Hearing

7/1/2013 - Notice of Hearing

Notice of Cancellation

7/31/2013 - Notice of Cancellation

Notice of Hearing

9/18/2013 - Notice of Hearing

Hearing Proceedings

11/18/2013 - Hearing Proceedings

 

Docket Entries

04/03/2014
View Court Documents

DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice; Comment (AMENDED ); Vol./Book: 50674; Page: 523; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 112204153

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2014

DispositionDismissed Before Hearing - Other

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2013
View Court Documents

DocketHearing Proceedings

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2013
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Hearing; November 18, 2013 AT 8:45AM RM 990

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2013
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Cancellation; Wednesday, August 7, 2013 at 8:30 A.M

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2013
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Hearing; August 7, 2013 @ 8:30AM RM 990, CHAMBERS 1005A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2013

DocketNon-Military Affidavit; Party: Defendant Quarles, Kimberly S; Party: Defendant Quarles, Dennis E

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2013

DocketMotion for Default & Default; (clerk's) against df, Dennis E. Quarles and Kimberly S. Quarles; Party: Plaintiff Lakeside Nat Foods Inc

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2013

DocketDefault Returned - Attorney Notified; Case Style listed on Default (Suntrust Bank vs Dennis E Quarles and Kimberly S. Quarles) does not match listed Case Style/Case number (Lakeside Nat Foods, Inc vs Dennis E Quarles and Kimberly S. Quarles) in system

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2013

DocketSummons Returned Served; 1/19/13; Party: Defendant Quarles, Kimberly S

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2013

DocketSummons Returned Served; 1/19/13; Party: Defendant Quarles, Dennis E

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/11/2012

DocketSummons Issued; hb/ps; Party: Defendant Quarles, Dennis E; Party: Defendant Quarles, Kimberly S

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/11/2012

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/11/2012

DocketPetition

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/11/2012

DocketFiling Fee; Payor: GILL, ALBERT GAVIN-WAYNE ; Userid: CTS-adaniels ; Receipt: 20121YE1G004275; Comments: CK 1618 S-2 HB TO PS ; Amount: $401.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/11/2012

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: GILL, ALBERT GAVIN-WAYNE ; Userid: CTS-adaniels ; Receipt: 20121YE1G004275; Comments: CK 1618 S-2 HB TO PS ; Amount: $20.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less