This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 16:55:48 (UTC).

Kimberly Boothe Plaintiff vs. Kathy D Hunter Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/05/2018 Kimberly Boothe Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Kathy D Hunter Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Levine, Olga. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1783

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Levine, Olga

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Boothe, Kimberly

Defendant

Hunter, Kathy D

 

Court Documents

Memo

3/7/2018 - Memo

Mediation Report

3/5/2018 - Mediation Report

Notice Setting Mediation

3/1/2018 - Notice Setting Mediation

Order Referring Case to Mediation

2/19/2018 - Order Referring Case to Mediation

Notice of Non-Compliance

2/12/2018 - Notice of Non-Compliance

Notice of Filing

2/12/2018 - Notice of Filing

Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer

2/12/2018 - Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer

Summons Served-Posted

2/7/2018 - Summons Served-Posted

Answer to Tenant Eviction

2/7/2018 - Answer to Tenant Eviction

Copy of Receipt for Rent

2/7/2018 - Copy of Receipt for Rent

Complaint

2/5/2018 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

2/5/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

Stipulation & Order Approving Settlement

3/5/2018 - Stipulation & Order Approving Settlement

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemo; sent regarding stipulation entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketRent Disbursed; To Pl $1100.00 - Ck# 94383

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionStipulation & Order Approving Settlement; Comment (and Disbursing funds in Court Registry Forthwith ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 114928286

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMediation Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Setting Mediation; MARCH 2,2018 at 2 pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Referring Case to Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Non-Compliance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Non-Military Affidavit; Party: Plaintiff Boothe, Kimberly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Strike Defendant's Answer; And For Default Final Judgment For Tenant Eviction; Party: Plaintiff Boothe, Kimberly

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketCourt Registry Clerk's Fee; Payor: KATHY HUNTER D ; Userid: CTS-yramsay ; Receipt: 20183YF3D000243; Comments: JANUARY RENT ; Amount: $24.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Served-Posted; 2/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Tenant Eviction; X; Party: Defendant Hunter, Kathy D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Receipt for Rent; X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: KIMBERLY BOOTHE ; Userid: CTS-vlopez ; Receipt: 20183YF3E000188; Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: KIMBERLY BOOTHE ; Userid: CTS-vlopez ; Receipt: 20183YF3E000188; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint; FOR TENANT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued to Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less