This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 15:26:21 (UTC).

KEVIN J KESSLER MD PA Plaintiff vs. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/08/2019 KEVIN J KESSLER MD PA Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County North Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DeLuca, Steven P.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2966

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DeLuca, Steven P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KEVIN J KESSLER MD PA

Tintori, Teresa

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Prince, Michael Ryan

Attorney at Ged Lawyers LLP

7171 North Federal Highway

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant Attorney

Foman, William R, ESQ.

Attorney at Williams, Leininger & Cosby. P.A

11300 Us Highway One, Suite 300

North Palm Beach, FL 33408

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

7/5/2019 - Notice of Settlement

Notice of Unavailability

7/3/2019 - Notice of Unavailability

Motion for Entry

6/28/2019 - Motion for Entry

Request to Produce

6/26/2019 - Request to Produce

Interrogatories & Notice of Filing

6/26/2019 - Interrogatories & Notice of Filing

Request for Production

6/26/2019 - Request for Production

Interrogatories

6/26/2019 - Interrogatories

Request to Produce

6/26/2019 - Request to Produce

Motion

6/26/2019 - Motion

Notice

6/25/2019 - Notice

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

4/12/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Appearance

4/9/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

4/9/2019 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

Demand for Jury Trial

4/9/2019 - Demand for Jury Trial

Summons Returned Served

3/6/2019 - Summons Returned Served

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

2/8/2019 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/8/2019 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Civil Cover Sheet

2/8/2019 - Civil Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115957596

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Party: Plaintiff KEVIN J KESSLER MD PA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Entry; OF FINAL JUDGMENT; Party: Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; ATTORNEY AND LEGAL ASSISTANT BILLING RECORDS OF DEFENDANT; Party: Plaintiff KEVIN J KESSLER MD PA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories & Notice of Filing; (FIRST SET OF ATTORNEYS FEES); Party: Plaintiff KEVIN J KESSLER MD PA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; TO DEFENDANT ON ATTORNEY FEES, COSTS AND INTEREST ISSUES; Party: Plaintiff KEVIN J KESSLER MD PA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories; (CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT) TO DEFENDANT; Party: Plaintiff KEVIN J KESSLER MD PA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; (CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT) TO DEFENDANT; Party: Plaintiff KEVIN J KESSLER MD PA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 3/6/19 - NO SUMMONS ATTACHED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: MICHAEL PRINCE ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A022830; Amount: $55.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: MICHAEL PRINCE ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A022830; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FOMAN, WILLIAM RANDOLPH