This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 04/14/2020 at 15:10:11 (UTC).

Kerry Hodge Plaintiff vs. Ceres Environmental Services, Inc , et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 03/05/2020 Kerry Hodge Plaintiff filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Ceres Environmental Services, Inc , Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Frink, Keathan B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4271

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Frink, Keathan B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hodge, Kerry

Defendants

Ceres Environmental Services, Inc

Biggs , Davis Coleman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lariosa, Michael J

Attorney at Robert J Fenstersheib & Assoc., P.A

520 W Hallandale Beach Blvd

Hallandale, FL 33009

Defendant Attorney

Ippoliot-Craven, Francesca

Attorney at KUBICKI DRAPER

9100 South Dadeland Boulevard, Suite 1800

Miami, FL 33156

 

Court Documents

Notice of Taking Deposition

4/14/2020 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Request to Produce

4/9/2020 - Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogs

4/9/2020 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Notice of Appearance

4/1/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

4/1/2020 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

4/1/2020 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Summons Returned Served

3/23/2020 - Summons Returned Served

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

3/12/2020 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

Civil Cover Sheet

3/5/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

3/5/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance

3/5/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

3/5/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Interrogatories

3/5/2020 - Interrogatories

Request for Production

3/5/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

3/5/2020 - Request for Admissions

Interrogatories

3/5/2020 - Interrogatories

Request for Production

3/5/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

3/5/2020 - Request for Admissions

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses; Party: Defendant Ceres Environmental Services, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Party: Defendant Ceres Environmental Services, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 12th day of March, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $30,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; DAVIS COLEMAN BIGGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; CERES ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories; TO DEFENDANT DAVIS COLEMAN BIGGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; TO DEFENDANT DAVIS COLEMAN BIGGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; TO DEFENDANT DAVIS COLEMAN BIGGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories; TO DEFENDANT CERES ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; TO DEFENDANT CERES ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; TO DEFENDANT CERES ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ceres Environmental Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lariosa, Michael J