This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 10/15/2021 at 20:51:14 (UTC).

Kenneth D Cooper Plaintiff vs. Broward County Value Adjustment Board, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 11/08/2012 Kenneth D Cooper Plaintiff filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Broward County Value Adjustment Board, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1581

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cooper, Kenneth D

Defendants

Broward County Value Adjustment Board

Broward County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cooper, Kenneth D

Defendant Attorney

Kiar, Monroe D

 

Court Documents

Mediation Report

1/22/2015 - Mediation Report

Notice of Mediation

1/7/2015 - Notice of Mediation

Expert Witness List

1/6/2015 - Expert Witness List

Pretrial Conference Order

12/4/2014 - Pretrial Conference Order

Answer to Interrogs

12/3/2014 - Answer to Interrogs

Response to Request to Produce

12/3/2014 - Response to Request to Produce

Order

11/18/2014 - Order

Agreed Order

11/18/2014 - Agreed Order

Motion to Compel Discovery

11/14/2014 - Motion to Compel Discovery

Notice of Hearing

11/4/2014 - Notice of Hearing

Motion to Set Cause for Trial

11/4/2014 - Motion to Set Cause for Trial

Notice of Service of Interrogs

9/22/2014 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Interrogatories

9/22/2014 - Interrogatories

Notice of Service

9/22/2014 - Notice of Service

Request for Production

9/22/2014 - Request for Production

Motion to Set Cause for Trial

9/17/2014 - Motion to Set Cause for Trial

Motion to Set Cause for Trial

9/15/2014 - Motion to Set Cause for Trial

Notice of Appearance

10/14/2013 - Notice of Appearance

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/23/2015
View Court Documents

DispositionVoluntary Dismissal With Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 112959851

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2015
View Court Documents

DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 112922369

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2015

DispositionDismissed After Hearing - Pursuant to Settlement

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2015
View Court Documents

DocketMediation Report; settlement agreement

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2015
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Mediation; January 21,2015 @ 3:30 p.m

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/06/2015
View Court Documents

DocketExpert Witness List; NOTICE OF EXPERT WITNESS; Party: Defendant Broward County Value Adjustment Board

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2014
View Court Documents

DocketPretrial Conference Order; 04/13/15 and Ccall 04/06/15 at 10:30 rm 1050 / Non-Jury

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2014
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer to Interrogs; Party: Plaintiff Cooper, Kenneth D

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2014
View Court Documents

DocketResponse to Request to Produce; Party: Plaintiff Cooper, Kenneth D

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2014
View Court Documents

DocketOrder; MOTION TO SET TRIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
42 More Docket Entries
04/04/2013
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Limited Appearance; Monroe D. Kiar, Esquire; Party: Defendant Broward County Value Adjustment Board

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2013
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Unavailability; Monroe D. Kiar, Esquire

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2013

DocketOrder to Show Cause; Appellant shall have 20 days from the date o this order to show cause in writing why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of appellate jurisdiction. Appellant shall file all orig docs with the Clerk of Court, and provide courtesy copies to the undersigned pursuant to the procedure set forth in Admin. Order 2012-28- Gen. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of this appeal (see file)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2013

DocketOrder Of Recusal; and Directions to the Clerk of Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2012

DocketMotion for Extension of Time; to file the initial brief or Ans Brief or Reply Brief and Complete the Record on Appeal. 30 or 60 days; Party: Plaintiff Cooper, Kenneth D

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2012

DocketMotion for Extension of Time; to File Transcript of Final Jgmt HRG. 30 days; Party: Plaintiff Cooper, Kenneth D

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2012

DocketNo Summons Issued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2012

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2012

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2012

DocketFiling Fee; Payor: COOPER, KENNETH D ; Userid: CTS-rsukhlall ; Receipt: 20121YE1B005523; Comments: CK#25090/NSIS ; Amount: $401.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less