This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/27/2020 at 14:35:07 (UTC).

Katherine Obert Beaulieu Plaintiff vs. David Paul Lister Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Katherine Obert Beaulieu Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against David Paul Lister Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Singer, Michele Towbin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5661

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Singer, Michele Towbin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Obert Beaulieu, Katherine

Defendant

Lister, David Paul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Balkan, Adam M

Attorney at BALKAN & PATTERSON , LLP

1877 S. Federal Highway, Suite 100

Boca Raton, FL 33432-0000

 

Court Documents

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

9/24/2020 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

Civil Cover Sheet

9/23/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

9/23/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance

9/23/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Request to Produce

9/23/2020 - Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogs

9/23/2020 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; none

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $75,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; DAVID PAUL LISTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs; TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less