This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 04/19/2020 at 14:28:57 (UTC).

Jumbleberry Enterprises USA LTD Plaintiff vs. Glamorous Products Inc, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 03/11/2020 Jumbleberry Enterprises USA LTD Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Glamorous Products Inc, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Haury, William W., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4502

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Haury, William W., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jumbleberry Enterprises USA LTD

Defendants

Glamorous Products Inc

Nguyen, Charles "Hung"

 

Court Documents

Application

3/11/2020 - Application

eSummons Issuance

3/11/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

3/11/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Civil Cover Sheet

3/11/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Summons Returned Served

3/30/2020 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

3/30/2020 - Summons Returned Served

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 19th day of March, 2020; Party: Defendant Nguyen, Charles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 19th day of March, 2020; Party: Defendant Glamorous Products Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $35,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; GLAMOROUS PRODUCTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; CHARLES"HUNG" NGUYEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication; TO CONFIRM AMERICAN ARBITRATION ASSOCIATION FINAL AWARD AND FINAL JUDGMENT; Party: Plaintiff Jumbleberry Enterprises USA LTD

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA LTD. is a litigant